WebJan 18, 2024 · List of Chief Ministers of Uttarakhand (2000-2024) Check below the list of all CM of Uttarakhand for the period 2000-2024: SL. No: Name of CM: Period : Party : 1. Nityanand Swami: 9 November 2000 to … Web1 hour ago · Laxman Savadi Joins Congress: After being denied a ticket from the saffron party, the three-time MLA from Athani in Belagavi district resigned from the primary …
Who
http://cm.uk.gov.in/ WebJul 6, 2024 · Newly sworn-in Uttarakhand Chief Minister Pushkar Singh Dhami allocated portfolios to 11 newly-inducted state Ministers on Tuesday. All the 11 BJP legislators took oath as state Cabinet Mnisters on Sunday … random id in javascript
Maharashtra MP List: Full List of Lok Sabha Members From …
WebSource : CM Office, Uttarakhand, Last Updated on 22-08-2024 Site designed, developed and hosted by Contents on this website is published and managed by CM Office, Government of Uttarakhand. Web1 day ago · Saket Bahuguna, son of former Uttarakhand Chief Minister Vijay Bahuguna, and 17 other executives of financial services company Indiabulls have been booked over allegations of fraud. Advertisement. Ankit Sharma. New Delhi, UPDATED: Apr 12, 2024 23:17 IST. Case against executives of Indiabulls was registered based on a complaint by … WebApr 12, 2024 · Uttarakhand was formed on 9th November 2000 as the 27th State of India, when it was carved out of northern Uttar Pradesh. Located at the foothills of the Himalayan mountain ranges, it is largely a hilly State, having international boundaries with China (Tibet) in the north and Nepal in the east. On its north-west lies Himachal Pradesh, while on ... random iban generator javascript